Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Roman Borysiuk, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Goff Law Group Llc, against Michele Masini, Ryan Meagher, represented by Mazza & Welch, in the jurisdiction of New Haven County, CT, . New Haven County, CT Superior Courts with James W. Abrams presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 27, 2020 |
CategoryV01 - Vehicular - Motor Vehicles - Driver And/Or Passenger(S) Vs. Driver(S) |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew Haven County, CT |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
MOTION FOR ORDER supp compliance RESULT: Denied 3/11/2022 HON JAMES ABRAMS
Date: January 24, 2022MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE RESULT: Granted 1/24/2022 HON JAMES ABRAMS
Date: January 24, 2022ORDER RESULT: Granted 1/24/2022 HON JAMES ABRAMS
Date: January 24, 2022OBJECTION TO MOTION Objection to Motion for Continuance
Date: January 24, 2022CASEFLOW REQUEST (JD-CV-116) RESULT: Granted 1/25/2022 HON JAMES ABRAMS
Date: January 25, 2022NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE
Date: February 26, 2021NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE Plaintiff's Supplemental Compliance
Date: March 05, 2021NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE Plaintiff's Amended Compliance
Date: March 05, 2021ORDER RESULT: Granted 1/25/2022 HON JAMES ABRAMS
Date: January 25, 2022CERTIFICATE OF CLOSED PLEADINGS AND CLAIM FOR TRIAL LIST
Date: November 25, 2020NOTICE
Date: November 25, 2020NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE Supplemental Compliance
Date: May 19, 2021NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE Supplemental Compliance
Date: July 20, 2021NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE Supplemental Compliance
Date: November 09, 2021NOTICE of request for supplemental compliance
Date: January 12, 2022ORDER RESULT: Off 1/25/2022 HON JAMES ABRAMS
Date: January 25, 2022APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: October 01, 2020CLAIM FOR JURY OF 6
Date: October 28, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: July 27, 2020NOTICE of service
Date: October 28, 2020MOTION FOR ORDER Motion for Sanctions
Date: January 26, 2022NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE
Date: February 02, 2022OFFER OF COMPROMISE
Date: February 03, 2022OBJECTION TO MOTION for sanctions
Date: February 18, 2022ORDER RESULT: Sustained 3/7/2022 HON JAMES ABRAMS
Date: March 07, 2022OBJECTION TO MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME RESULT: Sustained 3/7/2022 HON JAMES ABRAMS
Date: February 18, 2022ORDER RESULT: Denied 3/7/2022 HON JAMES ABRAMS
Date: March 07, 2022ORDER RESULT: Denied 3/11/2022 HON JAMES ABRAMS
Date: March 11, 2022ORDER RESULT: Sustained 3/11/2022 HON JAMES ABRAMS
Date: March 11, 2022DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESS
Date: April 07, 2022DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESS
Date: March 29, 2022WITHDRAWAL OF ACTION
Date: April 21, 2022SUMMONS
Date: July 27, 2020MOTION FOR ORDER supplemental compliance
Date: April 20, 2021MOTION FOR ORDER supplemental compliance
Date: July 20, 2021ANSWER
Date: October 28, 2020ORDER RESULT: Granted 3/8/2021 HON JAMES ABRAMS
Date: March 08, 2021SCHEDULING ORDER BY AGREEMENT C50,T02,T03,T11,T12,T61,V01,V04, V09 CASES
Date: December 15, 2020OBJECTION TO MOTION Objection to Motion for Order of Compliance
Date: April 29, 2021ORDER RESULT: Off 5/17/2021 HON JAMES ABRAMS
Date: May 17, 2021ORDER RESULT: Off 5/3/2021 HON JAMES ABRAMS
Date: May 03, 2021ORDER RESULT: Off 2/8/2021 HON JAMES ABRAMS
Date: February 08, 2021ORDER RESULT: Granted 12/21/2020 HON JAMES ABRAMS
Date: December 21, 2020COMPLAINT
Date: July 27, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 05, 2022 | Jury Selection / Trial | ||
April 25, 2022 | Remote Trial Management Conference | ||
April 21, 2022 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF ACTION | |
April 21, 2022 | Trial Management Conference | ||
April 07, 2022 | Docket Event | DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESS | |
March 29, 2022 | Docket Event | DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESS | |
March 11, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Denied 3/11/2022 HON JAMES ABRAMS | |
March 11, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Sustained 3/11/2022 HON JAMES ABRAMS | |
March 11, 2022 | Remote Hearing | ||
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Sustained 3/7/2022 HON JAMES ABRAMS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.