Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
Reverse Mortgage Solutions, Inc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Mccalla Raymer Leibert Pierce Llc, against Dennis Tucker, Gwendolyn Robinson, Karen Tucker, Secretary Of Housing And Urban Development, State Of Connecticut Department Of Administrative Services Representative Of The Estate Of Margaret Tucker, (total of 9) See All represented by Krislyn Mina Launer, in the jurisdiction of New Haven County, CT, . New Haven County, CT Superior Courts Superior with Walter M. Spader, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 16, 2019 |
CategoryP00 - Property - Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedApril 17, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationNew Haven County, CT |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
ORDER RESULT: Granted 6/20/2023 HON WALTER SPADER
Date: June 20, 2023AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE WITH EMAP
Date: November 04, 2022DEPOSIT RECEIVED
Date: February 27, 2023BILL OF COSTS FILED FOR TAXATION BY CLERK - PB SEC 18-5 RESULT: Order 12/29/2022 BY THE CLERK
Date: November 30, 2022ORDER RESULT: Granted 3/11/2024 HON WALTER SPADER
Date: March 11, 2024SUPPLEMENTAL RETURN
Date: January 31, 2022JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE BY SALE
Date: November 14, 2022APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: January 18, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: December 16, 2019ORDER RESULT: Granted 4/15/2024 HON WALTER SPADER
Date: April 15, 2024MOTION FOR SUPPLEMENTAL JUDGMENT
Date: February 28, 2024MOTION FOR SUPPLEMENTAL JUDGMENT Intervening Party, DAS
Date: April 02, 2024REQUEST TO AMEND COMPLAINT/AMENDMENT RESULT: Granted 11/12/2022 HON WALTER SPADER
Date: November 10, 2022FORECLOSURE WORKSHEET JD-CV-77
Date: November 04, 2022ADDITIONAL PARTIES PAGE
Date: December 16, 2019OATH OF APPRAISERS affidavit of appraiser dated 02/10/2023
Date: February 16, 2023ORDER RESULT: Granted 2/8/2022 BY THE CLERK
Date: February 08, 2022MOTION FOR DISTRIBUTION OF PROCEEDS
Date: June 06, 2023ORDER RESULT: Order 7/13/2022 BY THE CLERK
Date: July 13, 2022APPRAISAL
Date: October 25, 2022ORDER RESULT: Denied 7/1/2022 BY THE CLERK Watermark
Date: July 01, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF DEBT
Date: November 04, 2022AFFIDAVIT RE: ATTORNEY/COUNSEL FEES
Date: November 04, 2022ORDER RESULT: Order 12/29/2022 BY THE CLERK
Date: December 29, 2022SUMMONS
Date: December 16, 2019MILITARY AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 04, 2022COMPLAINT
Date: December 16, 2019AMENDED WRIT AND SUMMONS Amendment to Summons as of Right
Date: February 06, 2020APPEARANCE
Date: March 15, 2024RETURN OF SALE - WITH PROCEEDS
Date: April 20, 2023NOTICE OF JUDGMENT – CERTIFIED/SERVED
Date: November 30, 2022MILITARY AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 14, 2022ORDER RESULT: Granted 3/24/2024 HON WALTER SPADER
Date: March 24, 2024AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION
Date: January 31, 2022COMMITTEE DEED RESULT: Order 3/20/2023 HON MICHAEL KAMP
Date: March 20, 2023MOTION FOR DEFAULT -FAILURE TO APPEAR PB 17-20
Date: January 31, 2022ORDER RESULT: Granted 11/12/2022 HON WALTER SPADER
Date: November 12, 2022COMMITTEE REPORT
Date: March 02, 2023MOTION TO INTERVENE
Date: March 15, 2024MOTION FOR JUDGMENT-STRICT FORECLOSURE
Date: October 25, 2022ORDER RESULT: Granted 2/18/2022 HON JOHN CIRELLO
Date: February 18, 2022ORDER RESULT: Granted 3/20/2023 HON WALTER SPADER
Date: March 20, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 15, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 4/15/2024 HON WALTER SPADER | |
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SUPPLEMENTAL JUDGMENT Intervening Party, DAS | |
March 24, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 3/24/2024 HON WALTER SPADER | |
March 15, 2024 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE | |
March 15, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION TO INTERVENE | |
March 11, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 3/11/2024 HON WALTER SPADER | |
March 11, 2024 | Docket Event | SUPPLEMENTAL JUDGMENT RESULT: HON WALTER SPADER | |
February 28, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SUPPLEMENTAL JUDGMENT | |
June 20, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 6/20/2023 HON WALTER SPADER | |
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DISTRIBUTION OF PROCEEDS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.