Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Midwest Financial Credit Unit K N A Dfcu Financial, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Jacobs & Rozich Llc, against David E. Stubbs, represented by Woods Law Firm Llc, in the jurisdiction of New Haven County, CT, . New Haven County, CT Superior Courts with James W. Abrams presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 16, 2015 |
CategoryC40 - Contracts - Collections |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationNew Haven County, CT |
Matter TypeCollections |
ORDER RESULT: Granted 10/19/2016 HON JAMES ABRAMS
Date: October 19, 2016ORDER RESULT: Granted 4/27/2015 HON JON BLUE
Date: April 27, 2015ORDER RESULT: Denied 10/27/2015 BY THE CLERK
Date: October 27, 2015MOTION FOR DEFAULT-FAILURE TO PLEAD RESULT: Denied 6/10/2016 BY THE CLERK
Date: June 02, 2016NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S INTERROGATORIES AND REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION
Date: July 19, 2016OBJECTION TO MOTION FOR DEFAULT RESULT: Sustained 4/18/2016 HON SALVATORE AGATI
Date: April 06, 2016SUMMONS
Date: March 16, 2015TRIAL MANAGEMENT REPORT
Date: October 19, 2016APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: March 25, 2015CERTIFICATE OF CLOSED PLEADINGS AND CLAIM FOR TRIAL LIST
Date: July 19, 2016MOTION FOR DEFAULT-FAILURE TO PLEAD RESULT: Denied 4/26/2016 BY THE CLERK
Date: March 29, 2016MOTION FOR DEFAULT-FAILURE TO PLEAD RESULT: Denied 10/27/2015 BY THE CLERK
Date: October 19, 2015MOTION FOR DEFAULT-FAILURE TO PLEAD
Date: September 11, 2015AMENDED RETURN
Date: March 17, 2015MOTION FOR DEFAULT-FAILURE TO PLEAD RESULT: Denied 6/25/2015 BY THE CLERK
Date: June 17, 2015RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: March 16, 2015REVISED COMPLAINT
Date: July 02, 2015MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS PB 10-31
Date: November 30, 2015MOTION FOR JUDGMENT IN ACCORDANCE WITH STIPULATION RESULT: Granted 1/3/2017 HON JAMES ABRAMS
Date: December 08, 2016OBJECTION TO MOTION TO DISMISS
Date: November 30, 2015SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: September 07, 2017REPLY TO SPECIAL DEFENSE
Date: July 18, 2016COMPLAINT
Date: March 16, 2015ORDER RESULT: Order 1/4/2017 HON JAMES ABRAMS
Date: January 04, 2017MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE RESULT: Granted 10/19/2016 HON JAMES ABRAMS
Date: October 19, 2016ORDER RESULT: Granted 1/3/2017 HON JAMES ABRAMS
Date: January 03, 2017MOTION FOR ORDER OF COMPLIANCE – PB SEC 13-14 (INTERR/PROD – 13-6/13-9)
Date: October 07, 2016ORDER RESULT: Granted 8/22/2016 HON STEVEN ECKER
Date: August 22, 2016ANSWER AND SPECIAL DEFENSE
Date: June 09, 2016ORDER RESULT: Denied 6/10/2016 BY THE CLERK
Date: June 10, 2016ORDER RESULT: Sustained 4/18/2016 HON SALVATORE AGATI
Date: April 18, 2016ORDER RESULT: Denied 4/26/2016 BY THE CLERK
Date: April 26, 2016ORDER RESULT: Off 3/14/2016 HON LINDA LAGER
Date: March 14, 2016MOTION TO DISMISS PB 10-30 RESULT: Denied 4/18/2016 HON SALVATORE AGATI
Date: October 26, 2015ORDER RESULT: Denied 4/18/2016 HON SALVATORE AGATI
Date: April 18, 2016ORDER RESULT: Granted 10/5/2015 HON SALVATORE AGATI
Date: October 05, 2015MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO PLEAD RESULT: Granted 10/5/2015 HON SALVATORE AGATI
Date: September 18, 2015ORDER RESULT: Denied 10/8/2015 BY THE CLERK
Date: October 08, 2015REQUEST TO REVISE
Date: June 24, 2015ORDER RESULT: Denied 6/25/2015 BY THE CLERK
Date: June 25, 2015MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO PLEAD RESULT: Granted 4/27/2015 HON JON BLUE
Date: April 13, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 07, 2017 | Docket Event | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | |
January 04, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Order 1/4/2017 HON JAMES ABRAMS | |
January 03, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 1/3/2017 HON JAMES ABRAMS | |
January 03, 2017 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT BY STIPULATION BEFORE TRIAL COMMENCED RESULT: HON JAMES ABRAMS | |
December 08, 2016 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR JUDGMENT IN ACCORDANCE WITH STIPULATION RESULT: Granted 1/3/2017 HON JAMES ABRAMS | |
October 19, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 10/19/2016 HON JAMES ABRAMS | |
October 19, 2016 | Docket Event | TRIAL MANAGEMENT REPORT | |
October 19, 2016 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE RESULT: Granted 10/19/2016 HON JAMES ABRAMS | |
October 07, 2016 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR ORDER OF COMPLIANCE – PB SEC 13-14 (INTERR/PROD – 13-6/13-9) | |
August 22, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 8/22/2016 HON STEVEN ECKER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.