Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Connecticut Orthopaedic Specialist, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Tobin & Marohn, against Meg W Barber, represented by 80 Flintlock Rd, in the jurisdiction of New Haven County, CT, . New Haven County, CT Superior Courts with Elpedio N. Vitale presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 22, 2014 |
CategoryC40 - Contracts - Collections |
Last RefreshedJuly 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationNew Haven County, CT |
Matter TypeCollections |
ORDER RESULT: Granted 3/23/2015 HON ELPEDIO VITALE
Date: March 23, 2015MOTION TO DISMISS PB 10-30 RESULT: Granted 3/23/2015 HON ELPEDIO VITALE
Date: January 22, 2015JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL RESULT: HON ELPEDIO VITALE
Date: March 23, 2015COMPLAINT
Date: December 24, 2014APPEARANCE
Date: December 22, 2014SUMMONS
Date: December 24, 2014RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: December 24, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 23, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 3/23/2015 HON ELPEDIO VITALE | |
March 23, 2015 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL RESULT: HON ELPEDIO VITALE | |
January 22, 2015 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DISMISS PB 10-30 RESULT: Granted 3/23/2015 HON ELPEDIO VITALE | |
December 24, 2014 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
December 24, 2014 | Docket Event | SUMMONS | |
December 24, 2014 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE | |
December 22, 2014 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.