Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Credit Acceptance Corporation, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Nair & Levin Law Offices Of P.C., against Maurice L Marks, represented by 317 Blake Circle, in the jurisdiction of New Haven County, CT, . New Haven County, CT Superior Courts with Elpedio N. Vitale presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 19, 2014 |
CategoryC40 - Contracts - Collections |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationNew Haven County, CT |
Matter TypeCollections |
ORDER RESULT: Granted 12/23/2014 HON ELPEDIO VITALE
Date: December 23, 2014COMPLAINT
Date: November 19, 2014ANSWER
Date: November 24, 2014SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: January 23, 2020MOTION FOR JUDGMENT IN ACCORDANCE WITH STIPULATION RESULT: Granted 12/23/2014 HON ELPEDIO VITALE
Date: December 09, 2014JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF BY STIPULATION BEFORE TRIAL COMMENCED RESULT: HON ELPEDIO VITALE
Date: December 23, 2014RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: November 19, 2014NOTICE OF JUDGMENT – CERTIFIED/SERVED
Date: December 29, 2014APPEARANCE
Date: November 24, 2014SUMMONS
Date: November 19, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 23, 2020 | Docket Event | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | |
December 29, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF JUDGMENT – CERTIFIED/SERVED | |
December 23, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 12/23/2014 HON ELPEDIO VITALE | |
December 23, 2014 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF BY STIPULATION BEFORE TRIAL COMMENCED RESULT: HON ELPEDIO VITALE | |
December 09, 2014 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR JUDGMENT IN ACCORDANCE WITH STIPULATION RESULT: Granted 12/23/2014 HON ELPEDIO VITALE | |
November 24, 2014 | Docket Event | ANSWER | |
November 24, 2014 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE | |
November 19, 2014 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
November 19, 2014 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE | |
November 19, 2014 | Docket Event | SUMMONS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.