Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Trisha Haynes, filed a(n) T90 - Torts - All Other case represented by Lynch Traub Keefe & Errante Pc, against Burger King Corporation, represented by Calabrese John P Law Office Of, Howd & Ludorf Llc, in the jurisdiction of New Haven County, CT, . New Haven County, CT Superior Courts with Elpedio N. Vitale presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 31, 2014 |
CategoryT90 - Torts - All Other |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationNew Haven County, CT |
|
COMPLAINT
Date: October 31, 2014ORDER RESULT: Order 5/11/2015 HON ELPEDIO VITALE
Date: May 11, 2015ORDER RESULT: Granted 5/19/2015 HON JOHN NAZZARO
Date: May 19, 2015ANSWER AND SPECIAL DEFENSE
Date: January 30, 2015REPLY TO SPECIAL DEFENSE
Date: February 09, 2015MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT RESULT: Granted 1/11/2016 HON STEVEN ECKER
Date: May 26, 2015ORDER RESULT: Granted 1/11/2016 HON STEVEN ECKER
Date: January 11, 2016ORDER RESULT: Granted 1/7/2015 HON ELPEDIO VITALE
Date: January 07, 2015MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO PLEAD RESULT: Granted 12/5/2014 HON JOHN NAZZARO
Date: November 19, 2014ORDER RESULT: Granted 12/5/2014 HON JOHN NAZZARO
Date: December 05, 2014ORDER RESULT: Granted 4/9/2015 HON ROBIN WILSON
Date: April 09, 2015AGREEMENT
Date: December 10, 2015MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: May 26, 2015SUMMARY JUDGMENT-DEFENDANT RESULT: HON STEVEN ECKER
Date: January 11, 2016NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE
Date: June 18, 2015AFFIDAVIT Affidavit in support of Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: May 27, 2015CERTIFICATE OF CLOSED PLEADINGS AND CLAIM FOR TRIAL LIST
Date: February 09, 2015CLAIM FOR JURY OF 6
Date: January 30, 2015APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: November 25, 2014APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: November 12, 2014RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: October 31, 2014SUMMONS
Date: October 31, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 11, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 1/11/2016 HON STEVEN ECKER | |
January 11, 2016 | Docket Event | SUMMARY JUDGMENT-DEFENDANT RESULT: HON STEVEN ECKER | |
December 10, 2015 | Docket Event | AGREEMENT | |
June 18, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE | |
May 27, 2015 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT Affidavit in support of Motion for Summary Judgment | |
May 26, 2015 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT RESULT: Granted 1/11/2016 HON STEVEN ECKER | |
May 26, 2015 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INTERROGATORIES OR PRODUCTION REQ P.B. 13-7(a)(2)/13-10(a)(2) | |
May 26, 2015 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | |
May 19, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 5/19/2015 HON JOHN NAZZARO | |
May 11, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Order 5/11/2015 HON ELPEDIO VITALE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.