Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Roller Bearing Company Of America, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by John J Feeney, Rosaleen Mary Crowley, against Multicut North America, Inc., represented by Hurwitz Sagarin Slossberg & Knuff Llc, in the jurisdiction of New Haven County, CT, . New Haven County, CT Superior Courts with Frank A. Iannotti presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 02, 2018 |
CategoryC90 - Contracts - All Other |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNew Haven County, CT |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
MOTION TO SEAL DOCUMENT RESULT: Off 7/23/2018 HON FRANK IANNOTTI
Date: July 03, 2018EXHIBITS Exhibit A to Notice of Removal
Date: July 23, 2018NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL DISTRICT COURT
Date: July 23, 2018RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: July 12, 2018APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: July 20, 2018SUMMONS FOR HEARING
Date: July 02, 2018SUPPLEMENTAL RETURN
Date: July 17, 2018RECEIPT OF NOTICE
Date: July 17, 2018PRE-SERVICE ORDER FOR HEARING AND NOTICE
Date: July 02, 2018AFFIDAVIT
Date: July 02, 2018PROPOSED WRIT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT
Date: July 02, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 23, 2018 | Docket Event | EXHIBITS Exhibit A to Notice of Removal | |
July 23, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL DISTRICT COURT | |
July 23, 2018 | Docket Event | REMOVED TO FEDERAL DISTRICT COURT RESULT: BY THE CLERK | |
July 20, 2018 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE Appearance | |
July 17, 2018 | Docket Event | SUPPLEMENTAL RETURN | |
July 17, 2018 | Docket Event | RECEIPT OF NOTICE | |
July 12, 2018 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE | |
July 03, 2018 | Docket Event | MOTION TO SEAL DOCUMENT RESULT: Off 7/23/2018 HON FRANK IANNOTTI | |
July 02, 2018 | Docket Event | SUMMONS FOR HEARING | |
July 02, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPLICATION FOR PREJUDGMENT REMEDY / HEARING (JD-CV-53) RESULT: Off 7/23/2018 HON FRANK IANNOTTI Last Updated: Additional Description - 07/23/2018 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.