Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Theodore M Batko Jr, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Farrell Geenty Sheeley And Boccalatte P., against Gail R Batko, represented by Brette Law Llc, in the jurisdiction of Middlesex County, CT, . Middlesex County, CT Superior Courts Superior with Gerard I. Adelman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGerard I. Adelman Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 26, 2023 |
CategoryF00 - Family - Dissolution Of Marriage - C.G.S. Chapter 815J |
Last RefreshedMarch 21, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMiddlesex County, CT |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 21, 2024 | Status Conference | ||
May 01, 2024 | Remote Pretrial Conference | ||
March 20, 2024 | Remote Pretrial Conference | ||
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Order 3/1/2024 HON GERARD ADELMAN | |
March 01, 2024 | Status Conference | ||
February 28, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 2/28/2024 HON NORMA SANCHEZ-FIGUEROA | |
February 16, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION TO COMPEL RESULT: Granted 2/28/2024 HON NORMA SANCHEZ-FIGUEROA | |
February 16, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE Plaintiff's Notice of Filing Discovery Requests | |
February 07, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE | |
February 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 2/2/2024 HON NORMA SANCHEZ-FIGUEROA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.