Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Laura Chiulli, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by 204 Cricket Knoll, against Jonathan P. Budlong, represented by 93 Oak St, in the jurisdiction of Middlesex County, CT, . Middlesex County, CT Superior Courts Superior with Rupal Shah presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 15, 2024 |
CategoryS25 - Small Claims - Small Claims - Contract - Other |
Last RefreshedApril 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationMiddlesex County, CT |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
SMALL CLAIMS WRIT AND NOTICE OF SUIT, JD-CV-40
Date: March 28, 2024ORDER RESULT: Order 4/1/2024 HON RUPAL SHAH
Date: April 01, 2024SMALL CLAIMS RETURN / STATEMENT OF SERVICE
Date: March 28, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Order 4/1/2024 HON RUPAL SHAH | |
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS WRIT AND NOTICE OF SUIT, JD-CV-40 | |
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS RETURN / STATEMENT OF SERVICE | |
March 15, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION TO WAIVE ENTRY FEE AND PAY COSTS OF SERVICE - SMALL CLAIMS RESULT: Granted 3/27/2024 HON RUPAL SHAH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.