Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Midland Credit Management, Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by London & London, against Robert Gleason, represented by 144 Brault Hill Rd, in the jurisdiction of Middlesex County, CT, . Middlesex County, CT Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 31, 2023 |
CategoryS15 - Small Claims - Small Claims - Collection - Purchase Debt |
Last RefreshedJanuary 23, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMiddlesex County, CT |
Matter TypeCollections |
EXECUTION ISSUED
Date: November 14, 2023ANSWER - SMALL CLAIMS
Date: June 20, 2023ORDER RESULT: Order 7/3/2023 SAUNDRA BORGES, MAG
Date: July 03, 2023SMALL CLAIMS WRIT AND NOTICE OF SUIT, JD-CV-40
Date: May 31, 2023APPLICATION FOR EXECUTION FINANCIAL INSTITUTION - NATURAL PERSON/INDIVIDUAL (JD-CV-24)
Date: November 13, 2023ACCEPTANCE OF INSTALLMENT PAYMENT SCHEDULE - SMALL CLAIMS
Date: June 20, 2023AFFIDAVIT OF DEBT - SMALL CLAIMS
Date: May 31, 2023SMALL CLAIMS RETURN / STATEMENT OF SERVICE
Date: May 31, 2023MILITARY AFFIDAVIT
Date: May 31, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 14, 2023 | Docket Event | EXECUTION ISSUED | |
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR EXECUTION FINANCIAL INSTITUTION - NATURAL PERSON/INDIVIDUAL (JD-CV-24) | |
July 03, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Order 7/3/2023 SAUNDRA BORGES, MAG | |
July 03, 2023 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF BY STIPULATION BEFORE TRIAL COMMENCED RESULT: SAUNDRA BORGES, MAG | |
June 20, 2023 | Docket Event | ANSWER - SMALL CLAIMS | |
June 20, 2023 | Docket Event | ACCEPTANCE OF INSTALLMENT PAYMENT SCHEDULE - SMALL CLAIMS | |
May 31, 2023 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS WRIT AND NOTICE OF SUIT, JD-CV-40 | |
May 31, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF DEBT - SMALL CLAIMS | |
May 31, 2023 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS RETURN / STATEMENT OF SERVICE | |
May 31, 2023 | Docket Event | MILITARY AFFIDAVIT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.