Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Nutmeg State Finc. Credit Union, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Tobin & Marohn, against Laury Eloise Braithwaite, represented by Tamara A Deberry, in the jurisdiction of Middlesex County, CT, . Middlesex County, CT Superior Courts with Rupal Shah presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 12, 2020 |
CategoryC40 - Contracts - Collections |
Last RefreshedAugust 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMiddlesex County, CT |
Matter TypeCollections |
MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME RESULT: Granted 5/9/2022 HON RUPAL SHAH
Date: April 21, 2022WITHDRAWAL OF ACTION
Date: August 12, 2022ORDER RESULT: Granted 5/9/2022 HON RUPAL SHAH
Date: May 09, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: November 12, 2020COMPLAINT
Date: November 12, 2020SUMMONS
Date: November 12, 2020APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: January 13, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 12, 2022 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF ACTION | |
August 12, 2022 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF ACTION RESULT: BY THE PLAINTIFF | |
May 09, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 5/9/2022 HON RUPAL SHAH | |
May 09, 2022 | Short Calendar SC-10 #002 | ||
April 21, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME RESULT: Granted 5/9/2022 HON RUPAL SHAH | |
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE Appearance | |
November 12, 2020 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE | |
November 12, 2020 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
November 12, 2020 | Docket Event | SUMMONS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.