Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Aaron Ramsey #390159, filed a(n) Habeas Corpus - Criminal case represented by The Mortimer Law Firm Llc, against Department Of Mental Health And Addiction Services, represented by Donna Marie Fusco, in the jurisdiction of Middlesex County, CT, . Middlesex County, CT Superior Courts with Vernon D. Oliver presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 02, 2020 |
CategoryM30 - Misc - Habeas Corpus (Extradition Release From Penal Institution) |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationMiddlesex County, CT |
Matter TypeHabeas Corpus |
ORDER RESULT: Granted 3/2/2020 HON MATTHEW FRECHETTE
Date: March 02, 2020APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: November 05, 2021APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: July 21, 2020APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: November 22, 2021SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: April 29, 2022ORDER RESULT: Order 4/1/2022 HON VERNON OLIVER
Date: April 01, 2022RETURN TO WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS
Date: July 13, 2022ORDER RESULT: Order 1/12/2023 HON VERNON OLIVER
Date: January 12, 2023LIST OF EXHIBITS (JD-CL-28/JD-CL-28a)
Date: January 12, 2023CERTIFICATE OF CLOSED PLEADINGS AND CLAIM FOR TRIAL LIST
Date: January 12, 2023LIST OF WITNESSES
Date: December 16, 2022REPLY
Date: December 16, 2022AMENDED RETURN
Date: December 09, 2022ORDER RESULT: Granted 12/23/2022 HON VERNON OLIVER
Date: December 23, 2022MOTION FOR PERMISSION TO AMEND MOTION OR PLEADING RESULT: Granted 12/23/2022 HON VERNON OLIVER
Date: December 09, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 12, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Order 1/12/2023 HON VERNON OLIVER | |
January 12, 2023 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF ACTION RESULT: HON VERNON OLIVER | |
January 12, 2023 | Docket Event | LIST OF EXHIBITS (JD-CL-28/JD-CL-28a) | |
January 12, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF CLOSED PLEADINGS AND CLAIM FOR TRIAL LIST | |
January 12, 2023 | Remote Court Trial | ||
January 12, 2023 | Trial | ||
December 23, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 12/23/2022 HON VERNON OLIVER | |
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event | LIST OF WITNESSES | |
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event | REPLY | |
December 09, 2022 | Docket Event | AMENDED RETURN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.