Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Haberfeld Enterprises, Llc, filed a(n) H00 - Housing - Summary Process case against Jalania Pantano Aka Jane Doe, Rich Carnegie, Sheree King, in the jurisdiction of Middlesex County, CT, . Middlesex County, CT Superior Courts with MAUREEN PRICE-BORELAND presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMAUREEN PRICE-BORELAND Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 30, 2019 |
CategoryH00 - Housing - Summary Process |
Last RefreshedDecember 15, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMiddlesex County, CT |
|
REPLY TO SPECIAL DEFENSE
Date: February 11, 2019COMPLAINT
Date: January 30, 2019HOUSING SUMMARY PROCESS SUMMONS (JD-HM-32)
Date: January 30, 2019ANSWER AND SPECIAL DEFENSE RICH CARNEGIE
Date: February 05, 2019ANSWER AND SPECIAL DEFENSE SHEREE KING
Date: February 05, 2019STIPULATION Re: S.KING & R. CARNEGIE-final stay 3/31/19
Date: February 25, 2019ORDER RESULT: Granted 2/25/2019 HON MAUREEN PRICE-BORELAND
Date: February 25, 2019ORDER Re:JALANIA PANTANO AKA JANE DOE RESULT: Granted 2/25/2019 HON MAUREEN PRICE-BORELAND
Date: February 25, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 26, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF JUDGMENT – CERTIFIED/SERVED Re:JALANIA PANTANO AKA JANE DOE | |
February 25, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION Re: S.KING & R. CARNEGIE-final stay 3/31/19 | |
February 25, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 2/25/2019 HON MAUREEN PRICE-BORELAND | |
February 25, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF WITH FINAL STAY BY STIPULATION RESULT: HON MAUREEN PRICE-BORELAND | |
February 25, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER Re:JALANIA PANTANO AKA JANE DOE RESULT: Granted 2/25/2019 HON MAUREEN PRICE-BORELAND | |
February 13, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER HEARING AND NOTICE scheduled 2/25/19 at 9am | |
February 11, 2019 | Docket Event | REPLY TO SPECIAL DEFENSE | |
February 11, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AND JUDGMENT OF POSSESSION SUMMARY PROCESS RESULT: Granted 2/25/2019 HON MAUREEN PRICE-BORELAND | |
February 05, 2019 | Docket Event | ANSWER AND SPECIAL DEFENSE RICH CARNEGIE | |
February 05, 2019 | Docket Event | ANSWER AND SPECIAL DEFENSE SHEREE KING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.