Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Marissa Luciani, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Lawrence & Jurkiewicz Llc, against Scott Luciani, represented by Conti Levy Salerno & Antonio Llc, in the jurisdiction of Litchfield County, CT, . Litchfield County, CT Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 02, 2024 |
CategoryF00 - Family - Dissolution Of Marriage - C.G.S. Chapter 815J |
Last RefreshedMarch 07, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLitchfield County, CT |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 06, 2024 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF RESOLUTION SCREENING (FORM JD-FM-290) | |
March 06, 2024 | Docket Event | FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT JD-FM-6-LONG | |
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event | FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT JD-FM-6-LONG | |
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE Defendant's Notice of Service for Request for Mandatory and Disclosure | |
February 26, 2024 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE Appearance | |
February 02, 2024 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE | |
February 02, 2024 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
February 02, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF AUTOMATIC COURT ORDERS | |
February 02, 2024 | Docket Event | SUMMONS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.