Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Jenifer-Lee M Bois, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by 388 Ireland St, against Kevin M Leclerc, represented by 240 Branch Road, Conti Levy Salerno & Antonio Llc, in the jurisdiction of Litchfield County, CT, . Litchfield County, CT Superior Courts with DAVID DEE, FSM presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 12, 2016 |
CategoryF85 - Family - Support Petition - C.G.S. 46B-215 |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLitchfield County, CT |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 29, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CLOSURE OF IV-D CHILD SUPPORT ENFORCEMENT SERVICES | |
January 29, 2018 | Docket Event | FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT JD-FM-6-SHORT | |
January 29, 2018 | Docket Event | WORKSHEET FOR THE CONNECTICUT CHILD SUPPORT AND ARREARAGE GUIDELINES CCSG-1 | |
January 29, 2018 | Docket Event | COURT ORDER - FAMILY SUPPORT MAGISTRATE - JD-FM-170 RESULT: Order 1/29/2018 DAVID DEE, FSM | |
January 29, 2018 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE | |
January 08, 2018 | Docket Event | MOTION TO MODIFY SUPPORT ENFORCEMENT SERVICES RESULT: Granted 1/29/2018 DAVID DEE, FSM | |
November 14, 2016 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT OF SUPPORT RESULT: DAVID DEE, FSM | |
November 14, 2016 | Docket Event | COURT ORDER - FAMILY SUPPORT MAGISTRATE - JD-FM-170 RESULT: Order 11/14/2016 DAVID DEE, FSM | |
November 14, 2016 | Docket Event | FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT JD-FM-6-SHORT | |
November 14, 2016 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.