Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Sara J. Jock, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by 12 Baker Rd, against Orry J. Jock, represented by 393 Main Street North, in the jurisdiction of Litchfield County, CT, . Litchfield County, CT Superior Courts with HON JOHN MOORE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 13, 2016 |
CategoryF00 - Family - Dissolution Of Marriage - C.G.S. Chapter 815J |
Last RefreshedOctober 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLitchfield County, CT |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 23, 2017 | Docket Event | FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT | |
February 23, 2017 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT OF UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION RESULT: HON JOHN MOORE | |
February 23, 2017 | Docket Event | AGREEMENT | |
February 23, 2017 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT FILE Agreement dated 02/23/2017 incorporated by reference | |
February 17, 2017 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE | |
February 16, 2017 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE | |
October 13, 2016 | Docket Event | SUMMONS | |
October 13, 2016 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
October 13, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF AUTOMATIC COURT ORDERS | |
October 13, 2016 | Docket Event | MOTION TO WAIVE ENTRY FEE AND PAY COSTS OF SERVICE RESULT: Granted 10/3/2016 HON JOHN DANAHER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.