Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Dawn Prince, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by C O Susan Dixon, against Gregory Prince, in the jurisdiction of Litchfield County, CT, . Litchfield County, CT Superior Courts with HON JOHN DANAHER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 26, 2014 |
CategoryF00 - Family - Dissolution Of Marriage - C.G.S. Chapter 815J |
Last RefreshedNovember 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLitchfield County, CT |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 31, 2015 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY APPEARANCE(S) AUTOWITHDRAWN PB 3-9 | |
March 04, 2015 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT OF UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION RESULT: HON JOHN DANAHER | |
March 04, 2015 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT FILE | |
March 04, 2015 | Docket Event | FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT JD-FM-6-SHORT | |
March 04, 2015 | Docket Event | SEPARATION AGREEMENT | |
March 04, 2015 | Docket Event | FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT JD-FM-6-LONG | |
January 07, 2015 | Docket Event | FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT JD-FM-6-LONG | |
January 05, 2015 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT AGREEMENT RESULT: Order 1/7/2015 HON JOHN DANAHER | |
September 26, 2014 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR EXCLUSIVE USE OF PREMISES | |
September 26, 2014 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR ORDER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.