Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Sandra Blodgett, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by 90 Orchard Street, against Joseph E. Blodgett, in the jurisdiction of Litchfield County, CT, . Litchfield County, CT Superior Courts with JAMES GINOCCHIO presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJAMES GINOCCHIO Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2013 |
CategoryF00 - Family - Dissolution Of Marriage - C.G.S. Chapter 815J |
Last RefreshedNovember 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLitchfield County, CT |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 17, 2015 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY APPEARANCE(S) AUTOWITHDRAWN PB 3-9 | |
February 18, 2015 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT FILE | |
February 18, 2015 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT OF UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION RESULT: HON JOHN DANAHER | |
February 13, 2015 | Docket Event | SEPARATION AGREEMENT | |
February 13, 2015 | Docket Event | STATEMENT | |
February 13, 2015 | Docket Event | FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT JD-FM-6-LONG | |
February 13, 2015 | Docket Event | FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT JD-FM-6-SHORT | |
February 13, 2015 | Docket Event | EXHIBITS | |
February 12, 2015 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE RESULT: Denied 2/17/2015 HON JOHN DANAHER | |
February 11, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Order 2/11/2015 HON JOHN DANAHER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.