Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Justin M. Wilcox, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Weaver Stephanie M. Law Offices Of Llc, against Kristene Wilcox, represented by Maureen Elizabeth Donahue, in the jurisdiction of Litchfield County, CT, . Litchfield County, CT Superior Courts with MICHAEL WU presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMICHAEL WU Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 12, 2013 |
CategoryF00 - Family - Dissolution Of Marriage - C.G.S. Chapter 815J |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLitchfield County, CT |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 07, 2020 | Docket Event | FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT JD-FM-6-LONG | |
January 07, 2020 | Docket Event | AGREEMENT RESULT: Granted 1/7/2020 HON DAN SHABAN | |
January 07, 2020 | Docket Event | WORKSHEET FOR THE CONNECTICUT CHILD SUPPORT AND ARREARAGE GUIDELINES CCSG-1 | |
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE | |
November 04, 2019 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ORDER - FAMILY SERVICES CASE MANAGEMENT (JD-FM-252) RESULT: Granted 11/4/2019 HON MICHAEL WU | |
November 04, 2019 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR REFERRAL BY CSSD FAMILY SERVICES (FORM JD-FM-230) RESULT: Granted 11/4/2019 HON MICHAEL WU | |
October 21, 2019 | Docket Event | AGREEMENT RESULT: Accepted 10/21/2019 HON JOHN DANAHER | |
October 21, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER | |
October 10, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION TO OPEN JUDGMENT | |
October 10, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR CONTEMPT POST-JUDGMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.