Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Aag, Jennifer Shippa, filed a(n) Paternity - Family case represented by 223 Egremont Plain Road, Steven L Samalot, against Anthony Stumbaugh Sr., represented by 47 Railroad Street, Joseph Jules Viau, in the jurisdiction of Litchfield County, CT, . Litchfield County, CT Superior Courts with DAVID DEE, FSM presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDAVID DEE, FSM Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2013 |
CategoryF80 - Family - Parentage Petition - C.G.S. 46B-160 |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLitchfield County, CT |
Matter TypePaternity |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 11, 2017 | Docket Event | COURT ORDER - FAMILY SUPPORT MAGISTRATE - JD-FM-170 RESULT: Order 12/11/2017 DAVID DEE, FSM | |
December 11, 2017 | Docket Event | FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT JD-FM-6-SHORT | |
November 06, 2017 | Docket Event | COURT ORDER - FAMILY SUPPORT MAGISTRATE - JD-FM-170 RESULT: Order 11/6/2017 DAVID DEE, FSM | |
November 03, 2017 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE | |
October 16, 2017 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE | |
September 28, 2017 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT CONCERNING CHILDREN | |
September 28, 2017 | Docket Event | MOTION TO WAIVE ENTRY FEE AND PAY COSTS OF SERVICE RESULT: Granted 9/28/2017 HON JOHN DANAHER | |
September 28, 2017 | Docket Event | MOTION TO MODIFY - GENERAL RESULT: Granted 12/11/2017 DAVID DEE, FSM | |
September 11, 2017 | Docket Event | COURT ORDER - FAMILY SUPPORT MAGISTRATE - JD-FM-170 RESULT: Order 9/11/2017 DAVID DEE, FSM | |
July 31, 2017 | Docket Event | COURT ORDER - FAMILY SUPPORT MAGISTRATE - JD-FM-170 RESULT: Order 7/31/2017 DAVID DEE, FSM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.