Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Douglas Knecht, filed a(n) General Family - Family case represented by Cramer & Anderson Llp, against Jessica March, represented by Moots Pellegrini P.C., in the jurisdiction of Litchfield County, CT, . Litchfield County, CT Superior Courts with JAMES GINOCCHIO presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJAMES GINOCCHIO Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 11, 2013 |
CategoryF40 - Family - Custody Application - C.G.S. 46B-61 |
Last RefreshedNovember 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLitchfield County, CT |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 02, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Denied 2/2/2021 HON MICHAEL WU | |
December 07, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Order 12/7/2020 HON MICHAEL WU | |
October 07, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER | |
August 24, 2020 | Docket Event | POST-JUDGMENT MOTION FOR MODIFICATION - CUSTODY, VISITATION | |
October 16, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR CONTEMPT | |
March 13, 2019 | Docket Event | CASEFLOW REQUEST (JD-CV-116) RESULT: Granted 3/15/2019 HON JOHN DANAHER | |
March 05, 2019 | Docket Event | OBJECTION TO MOTION | |
February 26, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM | |
February 26, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR CONTEMPT POST-JUDGMENT | |
February 26, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR ORDER POST-JUDGMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.