Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
62-64 Bank Street, Llc, filed a(n) H00 - Housing - Summary Process case represented by Cramer & Anderson Llp, against Carmine Amelio, represented by 32 Main Street, in the jurisdiction of Litchfield County, CT, . Litchfield County, CT Superior Courts Superior with Jason M. Lobo presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 01, 2024 |
CategoryH00 - Housing - Summary Process |
Last RefreshedApril 10, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationLitchfield County, CT |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint involves a dispute between 62-64 Bank Street, LLC (the Plaintiff) and Carmine Amelio (the Defendant) regarding nonpayment of rent and other expenses for commercial property located at 64 Bank Street in New Milford, Connecticut. The Pla...
REPLY TO SPECIAL DEFENSE 102.00
Date: March 19, 2024ANSWER AND SPECIAL DEFENSE
Date: March 14, 2024APPEARANCE
Date: March 13, 2024NOTICE TO QUIT POSSESSION - ORIGINAL SUMMARY PROCESS
Date: March 01, 2024NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL DISTRICT COURT
Date: April 04, 2024MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE RESULT: Granted 3/26/2024 HON JASON LOBO
Date: March 20, 2024HOUSING SUMMARY PROCESS SUMMONS (JD-HM-32)
Date: March 01, 2024ORDER RESULT: Granted 3/26/2024 HON JASON LOBO
Date: March 26, 2024RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: March 01, 2024COMPLAINT
Date: March 01, 2024MOTION FOR DEFAULT FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AND JUDGMENT OF POSSESSION SUMMARY PROCESS
Date: March 12, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 09, 2024 | Trial | ||
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL DISTRICT COURT | |
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 3/26/2024 HON JASON LOBO | |
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE RESULT: Granted 3/26/2024 HON JASON LOBO | |
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event | REPLY TO SPECIAL DEFENSE 102.00 | |
March 14, 2024 | Docket Event | ANSWER AND SPECIAL DEFENSE | |
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE | |
March 12, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AND JUDGMENT OF POSSESSION SUMMARY PROCESS | |
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO QUIT POSSESSION - ORIGINAL SUMMARY PROCESS | |
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event | HOUSING SUMMARY PROCESS SUMMONS (JD-HM-32) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.