Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
Janice Pinnell, Jeffrey L. Lynds, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case represented by Czepiga Daly Pope & Perri Llc, against Douglas K. O'Connell Esq Temporary Administrator Of The Estate Of Lahmer Lynds Jr., Maria Jokhova Aka Maria Gokhova Aka Yuliya Lynds-Babak, represented by Cramer & Anderson, in the jurisdiction of Litchfield County, CT, . Litchfield County, CT Superior Courts Superior with Ann E. Lynch presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 07, 2023 |
CategoryW00 - Wills - Probate Appeals |
Last RefreshedApril 26, 2024 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationLitchfield County, CT |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This legal document involves an appeal challenging the validity of Lahmer Lynds, Jr.'s Last Will and Testament, filed by Jeffrey Lynds and Janice Pinnell against Maria Jokhova a/k/a Maria Gokhova a/k/a Yulia Lynds-Babak. The complaint alleges lack of...
COMPLAINT
Date: December 07, 2023APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: January 11, 2024SUMMONS
Date: December 07, 2023MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO PLEAD
Date: February 05, 2024RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: December 27, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 25, 2024 | Remote Status Conference | ||
April 24, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 4/24/2024 HON ANN LYNCH | |
April 24, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE | |
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 4/10/2024 HON ANN LYNCH | |
March 08, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO PLEAD with consent RESULT: Granted 4/10/2024 HON ANN LYNCH | |
February 05, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO PLEAD | |
January 11, 2024 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE Appearance | |
December 27, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE | |
December 07, 2023 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
December 07, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.