Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Td Bank Usa, N.A., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Howard Lee Schiff Pc Law Offices, against Brianna N Tabak, represented by 64 Beech Hill Rd, Tamara A Deberry, in the jurisdiction of Litchfield County, CT, . Litchfield County, CT Superior Courts with Jessica C. Torres Shlatz presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJessica C. Torres Shlatz Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 15, 2021 |
CategoryS00 - Small Claims - Small Claims - Collection - Credit Card (Original Owner) |
Last RefreshedOctober 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLitchfield County, CT |
Matter TypeCollections |
ORDER RESULT: Order 11/29/2021 HON JOHN MOORE
Date: November 29, 2021MOTION TO CORRECT - SMALL CLAIMS RESULT: Granted 1/14/2022 HON JESSICA TORRES
Date: December 20, 2021SMALL CLAIMS RETURN / STATEMENT OF SERVICE
Date: September 15, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF DEBT - SMALL CLAIMS
Date: September 15, 2021APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: September 21, 2021SMALL CLAIMS WRIT AND NOTICE OF SUIT, JD-CV-40
Date: September 15, 2021ORDER RESULT: Granted 1/14/2022 HON JESSICA TORRES
Date: January 14, 2022ORDER RESULT: Order 12/17/2021 HON JESSICA TORRES
Date: December 17, 2021SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT - SMALL CLAIMS
Date: July 06, 2022MILITARY AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 15, 2021EXHIBITS
Date: September 15, 2021ANSWER - SMALL CLAIMS
Date: September 21, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 06, 2022 | Docket Event | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT - SMALL CLAIMS | |
January 14, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 1/14/2022 HON JESSICA TORRES | |
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION TO CORRECT - SMALL CLAIMS RESULT: Granted 1/14/2022 HON JESSICA TORRES | |
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Order 12/17/2021 HON JESSICA TORRES | |
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT AFTER COMPLETED TRIAL TO THE COURT WITH NO JURY RESULT: HON JESSICA TORRES | |
December 17, 2021 | Remote Court Trial | ||
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Order 11/29/2021 HON JOHN MOORE | |
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION - SEE FILE - SMALL CLAIMS MOTION TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE RESULT: Order 11/29/2021 HON JOHN MOORE | |
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE Appearance | |
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event | ANSWER - SMALL CLAIMS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.