Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Lvnv Funding, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Schreiber Law Llc, against Mark Lord, represented by 182 S Main St # 2, in the jurisdiction of Litchfield County, CT, . Litchfield County, CT Superior Courts with Jason M. Lobo presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 27, 2021 |
CategoryS15 - Small Claims - Small Claims - Collection - Purchase Debt |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLitchfield County, CT |
Matter TypeCollections |
ORDER RESULT: Order 9/24/2021 HON JASON LOBO
Date: September 24, 2021ANSWER - SMALL CLAIMS
Date: August 17, 2021EXHIBITS
Date: July 27, 2021SMALL CLAIMS RETURN / STATEMENT OF SERVICE
Date: July 27, 2021SMALL CLAIMS WRIT AND NOTICE OF SUIT, JD-CV-40
Date: July 27, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF DEBT - SMALL CLAIMS
Date: July 27, 2021MILITARY AFFIDAVIT
Date: July 27, 2021APPLICATION FOR EXECUTION-WAGES (JD-CV-3)
Date: October 24, 2022EXECUTION ISSUED - WAGES
Date: October 31, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event | EXECUTION ISSUED - WAGES | |
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR EXECUTION-WAGES (JD-CV-3) | |
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Order 9/24/2021 HON JASON LOBO | |
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT WITHOUT TRIAL FOR PLAINTIFF RESULT: HON JASON LOBO | |
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event | ANSWER - SMALL CLAIMS | |
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event | EXHIBITS | |
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS RETURN / STATEMENT OF SERVICE | |
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS WRIT AND NOTICE OF SUIT, JD-CV-40 | |
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF DEBT - SMALL CLAIMS | |
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event | MILITARY AFFIDAVIT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.