Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
George E. Mendillo, filed a(n) M50 - Misc - Declaratory Judgment case represented by George Mendillo, John G Manning, against Connecticut Appellate Court, Judge Douglas S. Lavine Judge Of The Connecticut Appellate Court, Judge Eliot D. Prescott Judge Of The Connecticut Appellate Court, Judge Nina F. Elgo Judge Of The Superior Court, Tinley, Renehan & Dost, Llp, (total of 5) See All represented by Aag Jane R Rosenberg, Tinley Renehan & Dost Llp, in the jurisdiction of Litchfield County, CT, . Litchfield County, CT Superior Courts with Carl J. Schuman presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 03, 2016 |
CategoryM50 - Misc - Declaratory Judgment |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationLitchfield County, CT |
|
ORDER RESULT: Granted 11/28/2016 HON CARL SCHUMAN
Date: November 28, 2016MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION to Dismiss by State Defendants
Date: November 23, 2016COMPLAINT
Date: October 03, 2016ORDER RESULT: Granted 2/2/2017 HON CARL SCHUMAN
Date: February 02, 2017OBJECTION TO MOTION Objection to Motion to Dismiss (Entry #102.00)
Date: January 23, 2017MOTION TO DISMISS PB 10-30 by State Defendants
Date: November 23, 2016ORDER RESULT: Order 1/12/2017 HON CARL SCHUMAN
Date: January 12, 2017ORDER RESULT: Granted 11/7/2016 HON JOHN PICKARD
Date: November 07, 2016ORDER RESULT: Granted 1/9/2017 HON CARL SCHUMAN
Date: January 09, 2017REPLY MEMORANDUM in support of State Defs' motion to dismiss (102.00)
Date: January 25, 2017APPELLATE COURT DECISION APPEAL TRANSFERRED TO SUPREME COURT Watermark
Date: July 24, 2018APPELLATE COURT DECISION APPEAL TRANSFERRED TO SUPREME COURT
Date: May 18, 2017DRAFT JUDGMENT FILE
Date: February 23, 2017JUDGMENT FILE
Date: February 02, 2017ORDER RESULT: Granted 1/25/2017 HON CARL SCHUMAN
Date: January 25, 2017SUPREME COURT DECISION APPEAL REINSTATED
Date: September 21, 2018APPEAL TO APPELLATE COURT
Date: February 10, 2017MOTION FOR ARTICULATION
Date: March 22, 2017ORDER
Date: September 21, 2018SUMMONS
Date: October 03, 2016APPELLATE COURT MATERIAL
Date: March 31, 2017APPELLATE COURT MATERIAL RESULT: Order 4/6/2017 HON CARL SCHUMAN
Date: April 06, 2017APPELLATE COURT MATERIAL
Date: June 15, 2017APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: October 17, 2016APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: October 25, 2016RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: October 03, 2016APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: October 04, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 21, 2018 | Docket Event | SUPREME COURT DECISION APPEAL REINSTATED | |
September 21, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER | |
September 21, 2018 | Docket Event | CASE RESET TO DISPOSITION STATUS | |
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event | APPELLATE COURT DECISION APPEAL TRANSFERRED TO SUPREME COURT Watermark | |
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event | SUPREME COURT DECISION JUDGMENT/ORDER OF TRIAL COURT AFFIRMED RESULT: BY THE COURT | |
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event | CASE RESET TO DISPOSITION STATUS | |
June 22, 2017 | Docket Event | CASE RESET TO DISPOSITION STATUS | |
June 15, 2017 | Docket Event | APPELLATE COURT MATERIAL | |
May 18, 2017 | Docket Event | APPELLATE COURT DECISION APPEAL TRANSFERRED TO SUPREME COURT | |
April 06, 2017 | Docket Event | APPELLATE COURT MATERIAL RESULT: Order 4/6/2017 HON CARL SCHUMAN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.