Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Danbury Hospital, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Robert L Peat, against Keesha Arthur, in the jurisdiction of Litchfield County, CT, . Litchfield County, CT Superior Courts with John W. Pickard presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 22, 2016 |
CategoryC40 - Contracts - Collections |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLitchfield County, CT |
Matter TypeCollections |
ORDER RESULT: Granted 12/6/2016 HON JOHN PICKARD
Date: December 06, 2016COMPLAINT
Date: September 22, 2016MOTION FOR DEFAULT-FAILURE TO APPEAR AND JUDGMENT WITH ORDER OF PAYMENTS PB SECTION 17-23
Date: November 28, 2016NOTICE OF JUDGMENT – CERTIFIED/SERVED
Date: December 14, 2016RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: September 22, 2016SUMMONS
Date: September 22, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 14, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF JUDGMENT – CERTIFIED/SERVED | |
December 06, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 12/6/2016 HON JOHN PICKARD | |
December 06, 2016 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT WITHOUT TRIAL-PRACTICE BOOK SECTION 17-23 ET SEQ RESULT: HON JOHN PICKARD | |
November 28, 2016 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT-FAILURE TO APPEAR AND JUDGMENT WITH ORDER OF PAYMENTS PB SECTION 17-23 | |
September 22, 2016 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
September 22, 2016 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE | |
September 22, 2016 | Docket Event | SUMMONS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.