Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
OLIVER, SANDRA v. WEBSTER, MICHAEL Et Al
H13 - Housing - Small Claims Housing - Rent And/Or Damages case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Litchfield County, CT.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 17, 2016
Last Refreshed
October 23, 2023
Filing Location
Litchfield County, CT
Category
H13 - Housing - Small Claims Housing - Rent and/or Damages
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
General Torts
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
RETURN OF NOTICE
Date: Nov 18, 2021RETURN OF NOTICE Last Updated: Legend Code - 11/18/2021
Date: Nov 17, 2021ORDER
Date: Feb 14, 2017ORDER
Date: Jan 06, 2017ANSWER - SMALL CLAIMS
Date: Nov 09, 2016SMALL CLAIMS WRIT AND NOTICE OF SUIT, JD-CV-40
Date: Oct 17, 2016EXHIBITS
Date: Oct 17, 2016SMALL CLAIMS RETURN / STATEMENT OF SERVICE
Date: Oct 17, 2016Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 18, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURN OF NOTICE | |
November 17, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURN OF NOTICE Last Updated: Legend Code - 11/18/2021 | |
February 14, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER | |
February 14, 2017 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT AFTER COMPLETED TRIAL TO THE COURT FOR THE PLAINTIFF(S) RESULT: STEVEN PELLETIER, MAG | |
January 06, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER | |
November 09, 2016 | Docket Event | ANSWER - SMALL CLAIMS | |
October 17, 2016 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS WRIT AND NOTICE OF SUIT, JD-CV-40 | |
October 17, 2016 | Docket Event | EXHIBITS | |
October 17, 2016 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS RETURN / STATEMENT OF SERVICE |