Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Fia Card Services, N.A., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Howard Lee Schiff Pc Law Offices, against Rocco Dileo, in the jurisdiction of Litchfield County, CT, . Litchfield County, CT Superior Courts with John W. Pickard presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 29, 2014 |
CategoryC40 - Contracts - Collections |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLitchfield County, CT |
Matter TypeCollections |
ORDER RESULT: Rejected 5/11/2017 BY THE CLERK
Date: May 11, 2017APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: September 06, 2023EXECUTION ISSUED
Date: July 18, 2017ORDER RESULT: Granted 2/23/2015 HON JOHN PICKARD
Date: February 23, 2015EXECUTION RETURNED UNSATISFIED
Date: November 30, 2017RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: September 29, 2014MOTION FOR DEFAULT-FAILURE TO APPEAR AND JUDGMENT WITH ORDER OF PAYMENTS PB SECTION 17-23
Date: January 05, 2015COMPLAINT
Date: September 29, 2014NOTICE OF JUDGMENT – CERTIFIED/SERVED
Date: June 09, 2017EXECUTION REFILED AS CORRECTED - NO FEE RESULT: Granted 7/18/2017 BY THE CLERK
Date: July 11, 2017SUMMONS
Date: September 29, 2014MILITARY AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 01, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 06, 2023 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE Appearance | |
November 30, 2017 | Docket Event | EXECUTION RETURNED UNSATISFIED | |
July 18, 2017 | Docket Event | EXECUTION ISSUED | |
July 11, 2017 | Docket Event | EXECUTION REFILED AS CORRECTED - NO FEE RESULT: Granted 7/18/2017 BY THE CLERK | |
June 09, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF JUDGMENT – CERTIFIED/SERVED | |
May 11, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Rejected 5/11/2017 BY THE CLERK | |
May 03, 2017 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR EXECUTION FINANCIAL INSTITUTION-DEBTOR IS A NATURAL PERSON (JD-CV-24) | |
February 23, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 2/23/2015 HON JOHN PICKARD | |
February 23, 2015 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT WITHOUT TRIAL-PRACTICE BOOK SECTION 17-23 ET SEQ RESULT: HON JOHN PICKARD | |
January 05, 2015 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT-FAILURE TO APPEAR AND JUDGMENT WITH ORDER OF PAYMENTS PB SECTION 17-23 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.