Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Cavalry Investments, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Schreiber Law Llc, against Michelle Kioko, in the jurisdiction of Litchfield County, CT, . Litchfield County, CT Superior Courts with John W. Pickard presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn W. Pickard Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2013 |
CategoryC40 - Contracts - Collections |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLitchfield County, CT |
Matter TypeCollections |
ORDER RESULT: Rejected 11/2/2016 BY THE CLERK
Date: November 02, 2016NOTICE OF JUDGMENT – CERTIFIED/SERVED
Date: May 09, 2014ORDER RESULT: Granted 5/6/2014 HON JOHN PICKARD
Date: May 06, 2014ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL JUDGMENT Notice of Assignment of Judgment
Date: September 09, 2016REQUEST TO AMEND AND AMENDMENT
Date: January 09, 2014COMPLAINT
Date: December 31, 2013RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: December 31, 2013SUMMONS
Date: December 31, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 02, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Rejected 11/2/2016 BY THE CLERK | |
October 25, 2016 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR EXECUTION FINANCIAL INSTITUTION-DEBTOR IS A NATURAL PERSON (JD-CV-24) RESULT: Rejected 11/2/2016 BY THE CLERK | |
September 09, 2016 | Docket Event | ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL JUDGMENT Notice of Assignment of Judgment | |
May 09, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF JUDGMENT – CERTIFIED/SERVED | |
May 06, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 5/6/2014 HON JOHN PICKARD | |
May 06, 2014 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT WITHOUT TRIAL-PRACTICE BOOK SECTION 17-23 ET SEQ RESULT: HON JOHN PICKARD | |
April 29, 2014 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT-FAILURE TO APPEAR AND JUDGMENT WITH ORDER OF PAYMENTS PB SECTION 17-23 | |
January 09, 2014 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO AMEND AND AMENDMENT | |
December 31, 2013 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
December 31, 2013 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.