Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Asset Acceptance, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Tobin & Marohn, against Barbara Eseppi, in the jurisdiction of Litchfield County, CT, . Litchfield County, CT Superior Courts with John W. Pickard presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn W. Pickard Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2013 |
CategoryC40 - Contracts - Collections |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLitchfield County, CT |
Matter TypeCollections |
ORDER RESULT: Granted 6/9/2014 HON JOHN PICKARD
Date: June 09, 2014COMPLAINT
Date: December 31, 2013NOTICE OF JUDGMENT – CERTIFIED/SERVED
Date: July 02, 2014RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: December 31, 2013ORDER RESULT: Granted 3/5/2014 BY THE CLERK-ADMIN ACTION
Date: March 05, 2014MOTION FOR DEFAULT -FAILURE TO APPEAR PB 17-20
Date: February 25, 2014SUMMONS
Date: December 31, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 02, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF JUDGMENT – CERTIFIED/SERVED | |
June 09, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 6/9/2014 HON JOHN PICKARD | |
June 09, 2014 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT WITHOUT TRIAL FOR PLAINTIFF RESULT: HON JOHN PICKARD | |
May 23, 2014 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON DEFAULT failure to appear RESULT: Order 6/9/2014 HON JOHN PICKARD | |
March 05, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 3/5/2014 BY THE CLERK-ADMIN ACTION | |
February 25, 2014 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT -FAILURE TO APPEAR PB 17-20 | |
December 31, 2013 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
December 31, 2013 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE | |
December 31, 2013 | Docket Event | SUMMONS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.