Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Asset Acceptance, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Tobin & Marohn, against Brendan M Mcdonald, in the jurisdiction of Litchfield County, CT, . Litchfield County, CT Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2013 |
CategoryC40 - Contracts - Collections |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLitchfield County, CT |
Matter TypeCollections |
APPLICATION FOR EXECUTION-WAGES (JD-CV-3) RESULT: Granted 1/15/2016 BY THE CLERK
Date: January 06, 2016ORDER RESULT: Granted 3/3/2014 BY THE CLERK
Date: March 03, 2014ORDER RESULT: Granted 5/26/2015 HON RICHARD MARANO
Date: May 26, 2015COMPLAINT
Date: December 31, 2013MOTION FOR JUDGMENT FAILURE TO APPEAR RESULT: Granted 5/26/2015 HON RICHARD MARANO
Date: January 16, 2015SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: September 02, 2016EXECUTION ISSUED - WAGES
Date: January 15, 2016NOTICE OF JUDGMENT – CERTIFIED/SERVED
Date: June 02, 2015MILITARY AFFIDAVIT
Date: May 14, 2015MOTION FOR DEFAULT -FAILURE TO APPEAR PB 17-20
Date: February 18, 2014RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: December 31, 2013SUMMONS
Date: December 31, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 02, 2016 | Docket Event | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | |
January 15, 2016 | Docket Event | EXECUTION ISSUED - WAGES | |
January 06, 2016 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR EXECUTION-WAGES (JD-CV-3) RESULT: Granted 1/15/2016 BY THE CLERK | |
June 02, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF JUDGMENT – CERTIFIED/SERVED | |
May 26, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 5/26/2015 HON RICHARD MARANO | |
May 26, 2015 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT WITHOUT TRIAL FOR PLAINTIFF RESULT: HON RICHARD MARANO | |
May 14, 2015 | Docket Event | MILITARY AFFIDAVIT | |
January 16, 2015 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR JUDGMENT FAILURE TO APPEAR RESULT: Granted 5/26/2015 HON RICHARD MARANO | |
March 03, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 3/3/2014 BY THE CLERK | |
February 18, 2014 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT -FAILURE TO APPEAR PB 17-20 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.