Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Asset Acceptance, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Tobin & Marohn, against Barbara R Czerna, in the jurisdiction of Litchfield County, CT, . Litchfield County, CT Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 11, 2013 |
CategoryC40 - Contracts - Collections |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLitchfield County, CT |
Matter TypeCollections |
ORDER RESULT: Granted 1/29/2014 BY THE CLERK
Date: January 29, 2014COMPLAINT
Date: December 11, 2013NOTICE OF JUDGMENT – CERTIFIED/SERVED
Date: January 29, 2015ORDER RESULT: Granted 1/12/2015 HON RICHARD MARANO
Date: January 12, 2015MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON DEFAULT FAILURE TO APPEAR
Date: December 30, 2014NOTICE
Date: January 29, 2014MOTION FOR DEFAULT -FAILURE TO APPEAR PB 17-20
Date: January 17, 2014RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: December 11, 2013SUMMONS
Date: December 11, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 29, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF JUDGMENT – CERTIFIED/SERVED | |
January 12, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 1/12/2015 HON RICHARD MARANO | |
January 12, 2015 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT WITHOUT TRIAL FOR PLAINTIFF RESULT: HON RICHARD MARANO | |
December 30, 2014 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON DEFAULT FAILURE TO APPEAR | |
January 29, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 1/29/2014 BY THE CLERK | |
January 29, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE | |
January 17, 2014 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT -FAILURE TO APPEAR PB 17-20 | |
December 11, 2013 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
December 11, 2013 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE | |
December 11, 2013 | Docket Event | SUMMONS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.