Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Geico, A S O John Haddon, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Mcmanus Dennis M Law Office Of, against Ari Alfaro, Patricia Daveluy, in the jurisdiction of Litchfield County, CT, . Litchfield County, CT Superior Courts with John W. Pickard presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn W. Pickard Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 16, 2013 |
CategoryV01 - Vehicular - Motor Vehicles - Driver And/Or Passenger(S) Vs. Driver(S) |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLitchfield County, CT |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
ORDER RESULT: Granted 6/9/2014 HON JOHN PICKARD
Date: June 09, 2014ORDER RESULT: Granted 3/31/2014 BY THE CLERK-ADMIN ACTION
Date: March 31, 2014ORDER RESULT: Off 4/8/2014 HON JOHN PICKARD
Date: April 08, 2014ORDER RESULT: Granted 3/10/2014 HON JOHN DANAHER
Date: March 10, 2014ORDER RESULT: Order 2/7/2014 HON JOHN PICKARD
Date: February 07, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 09, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 6/9/2014 HON JOHN PICKARD | |
June 09, 2014 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT AFTER COMPLETED TRIAL TO THE COURT - HEARING IN DAMAGES RESULT: HON JOHN PICKARD | |
June 03, 2014 | Docket Event | MILITARY AFFIDAVIT FOR ARI ALFARO - HEARING IN DAMAGES 6/9/14 | |
June 03, 2014 | Docket Event | MILITARY AFFIDAVIT FOR PATRICIA DAVELUY- HEARING IN DAMAGES 6/9/14 | |
June 03, 2014 | Docket Event | BILL OF COSTS FOR HEARING IN DAMAGES 6/9/14 | |
June 03, 2014 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF DEBT FOR HEARING IN DAMAGES 6/9/14 | |
June 03, 2014 | Docket Event | EXHIBITS FOR HEARING IN DAMAGES 6/9/14 | |
June 03, 2014 | Docket Event | PROPOSED ORDER FOR HEARING IN DAMAGES 6/9/14 | |
June 03, 2014 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON DEFAULT FOR HEARING IN DAMAGE 6/9/14 | |
April 16, 2014 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF CLOSED PLEADINGS AND CLAIM FOR TRIAL LIST |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.