Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Bendett & Mchugh Pc, against Baldomero Martinez, Charlotte Hungerford Hospital, Jennie Rodriguez, Prohealth Physicians, Inc., represented by Apt 11 N, Apt 314, Hertzmark Crean & Lahey Llp, in the jurisdiction of Litchfield County, CT, . Litchfield County, CT Superior Courts with John W. Pickard presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn W. Pickard Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 12, 2013 |
CategoryP00 - Property - Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLitchfield County, CT |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
ORDER Judgment of Strict Foreclosure RESULT: Order 4/14/2014 HON WILSON TROMBLEY
Date: April 14, 2014ORDER RESULT: Off 3/4/2014 HON JOHN PICKARD
Date: March 04, 2014ORDER RESULT: Granted 3/31/2014 BY THE CLERK-ADMIN ACTION
Date: March 31, 2014ORDER RESULT: Granted 2/14/2014 BY THE CLERK
Date: February 14, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 21, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES | |
April 14, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER Judgment of Strict Foreclosure RESULT: Order 4/14/2014 HON WILSON TROMBLEY | |
April 14, 2014 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT OF STRICT FORECLOSURE RESULT: HON WILSON TROMBLEY | |
April 10, 2014 | Docket Event | MILITARY AFFIDAVIT as to Baldomero | |
April 10, 2014 | Docket Event | MILITARY AFFIDAVIT as to Jennie | |
April 10, 2014 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT RE: ATTORNEY/COUNSEL FEES | |
April 10, 2014 | Docket Event | OATH OF APPRAISERS | |
April 10, 2014 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE WORKSHEET JD-CV-77 | |
April 10, 2014 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF DEBT | |
April 10, 2014 | Docket Event | APPRAISAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.