Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Howard Lee Schiff Pc Law Offices, against April Maria, represented by 185 Ridgewood Acres, in the jurisdiction of Litchfield County, CT, . Litchfield County, CT Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2013 |
CategoryS00 - Small Claims - Small Claims - Collection - Credit Card (Original Owner) |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLitchfield County, CT |
Matter TypeCollections |
ORDER RESULT: Granted 3/2/2018 BY THE CLERK
Date: March 02, 2018SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT - SMALL CLAIMS
Date: March 01, 2018JUDGMENT AFTER COMPLETED TRIAL TO THE COURT FOR THE PLAINTIFF(S) RESULT: BY THE COURT
Date: January 21, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 02, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 3/2/2018 BY THE CLERK | |
March 01, 2018 | Docket Event | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT - SMALL CLAIMS | |
October 17, 2017 | Docket Event | EXECUTION ISSUED | |
September 01, 2017 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR EXECUTION FINANCIAL INSTITUTION-DEBTOR IS A NATURAL PERSON (JD-CV-24) | |
January 21, 2014 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT AFTER COMPLETED TRIAL TO THE COURT FOR THE PLAINTIFF(S) RESULT: BY THE COURT | |
December 20, 2013 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS RETURN / STATEMENT OF SERVICE | |
December 20, 2013 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS WRIT AND NOTICE OF SUIT, JD-CV-40 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.