Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Christina Williams, filed a(n) M90 - Misc - All Other case represented by The Mcminn Employment Law Firm Llc, against Pratt & Whitney, A Division Of Raytheon Technologies Corporation, represented by Anthony S Califano, Kevin Richard Brady, in the jurisdiction of Hartford County, CT, . Hartford County, CT Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 21, 2023 |
CategoryM90 - Misc - All Other |
Last RefreshedJanuary 24, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationHartford County, CT |
|
ORDER TMC ORDER RESULT: Order 1/22/2024 HON SUSAN COBB
Date: January 22, 2024CERTIFICATE OF CLOSED PLEADINGS AND CLAIM FOR TRIAL LIST
Date: October 10, 2023CLAIM FOR JURY OF 6
Date: October 10, 2023REPLY TO SPECIAL DEFENSE
Date: October 10, 2023ANSWER Answer and Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint
Date: September 29, 2023MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO PLEAD Motion on Consent for Extension of Time to Plead
Date: August 11, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: July 21, 2023APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: August 03, 2023SUMMONS
Date: July 21, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: July 21, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 03, 2025 | Jury Selection / Trial | ||
June 17, 2025 | Trial Management Conference | ||
January 22, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER TMC ORDER RESULT: Order 1/22/2024 HON SUSAN COBB | |
October 10, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF CLOSED PLEADINGS AND CLAIM FOR TRIAL LIST | |
October 10, 2023 | Docket Event | CLAIM FOR JURY OF 6 | |
October 10, 2023 | Docket Event | REPLY TO SPECIAL DEFENSE | |
September 29, 2023 | Docket Event | ANSWER Answer and Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint | |
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO PLEAD Motion on Consent for Extension of Time to Plead | |
August 03, 2023 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE Appearance | |
July 21, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.