Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Merissa Wright, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Levy Leff & Defrank Pc, against Alia Charfane, represented by Howard Kohn Sprague & Fitzgerald, in the jurisdiction of Hartford County, CT, . Hartford County, CT Superior Courts with Stuart D. Rosen presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 22, 2022 |
CategoryV01 - Vehicular - Motor Vehicles - Driver And/Or Passenger(S) Vs. Driver(S) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 31, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHartford County, CT |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE
Date: January 16, 2024MOTION FOR ORDER OF COMPLIANCE – PB SEC 13-14 (INTERR/PROD – 13-6/13-9)
Date: June 02, 2023NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE
Date: March 08, 2023CASEFLOW REQUEST (JD-CV-116) RESULT: Granted 12/8/2023 HON SUSAN COBB
Date: November 28, 2023OBJECTION Objection to Plaintiff's Notice of Compliance
Date: March 08, 2023NOTICE Notice of Service of Discovery
Date: March 16, 2023MOTION FOR JUDGMENT OF DEFAULT FOR FAILURE TO PLEAD AND POSSESSION SUMMARY PROCESS
Date: December 27, 2022CLAIM FOR JURY OF 6
Date: January 03, 2023OBJECTION
Date: March 08, 2023NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE Supplement Compliance and Certification Page
Date: March 17, 2023REPLY TO SPECIAL DEFENSE
Date: January 03, 2023MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE
Date: December 11, 2023ANSWER AND SPECIAL DEFENSE
Date: December 30, 2022ORDER RESULT: Order 3/13/2023 HON CARL SCHUMAN
Date: March 13, 2023CERTIFICATE OF CLOSED PLEADINGS AND CLAIM FOR TRIAL LIST
Date: March 03, 2023REQUEST TO AMEND COMPLAINT/AMENDMENT
Date: May 24, 2023ORDER RESULT: Granted 12/8/2023 HON SUSAN COBB
Date: December 08, 2023ORDER RESULT: Granted 12/11/2023 HON STUART ROSEN
Date: December 11, 2023ORDER RESULT: Granted 12/19/2022 HON MICHAEL KAMP
Date: December 19, 2022MOTION TO TRANSFER RESULT: Granted 12/19/2022 HON MICHAEL KAMP
Date: December 02, 2022COMPLAINT
Date: September 22, 2022APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: November 18, 2022SUMMONS
Date: September 22, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: September 22, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 01, 2024 | Jury Selection / Trial | ||
October 18, 2024 | Trial Management Conference | ||
January 29, 2024 | Short Calendar SC-13 #010 | ||
January 16, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE | |
January 10, 2024 | Remote Pretrial Conference | ||
December 12, 2023 | Remote Pretrial Conference | ||
December 11, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE | |
December 11, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 12/11/2023 HON STUART ROSEN | |
December 08, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 12/8/2023 HON SUSAN COBB | |
November 28, 2023 | Docket Event | CASEFLOW REQUEST (JD-CV-116) RESULT: Granted 12/8/2023 HON SUSAN COBB |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.