Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Commissioner Of Revenue Services, filed a(n) M90 - Misc - All Other case represented by John Ab Langmaid, Office Of Counsel, 11Th Floor, against Alexander Q. Jones, represented by 175 Woodin Street, in the jurisdiction of Hartford County, CT, . Hartford County, CT Superior Courts with Michael Wu presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 13, 2022 |
CategoryM90 - Misc - All Other |
Last RefreshedOctober 29, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationHartford County, CT |
|
CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FROM EXECUTION RESULT: Order 8/18/2022 HON MICHAEL WU
Date: May 13, 2022ORDER RESULT: Continuance 7/15/2022 HON JAMES GRAHAM
Date: July 15, 2022ORDER RESULT: Order 8/19/2022 HON MICHAEL WU
Date: August 19, 2022COMPLAINT
Date: May 17, 2022APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: June 07, 2022SUMMONS
Date: May 17, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 19, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Order 8/19/2022 HON MICHAEL WU | |
August 18, 2022 | Docket Event | RECORD CORRECTION ERROR see 102.88 RESULT: Order 8/18/2022 HON MICHAEL WU Watermark Last Updated: Legend Code - 08/19/2022 | |
August 17, 2022 | Hearing | ||
July 15, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Continuance 7/15/2022 HON JAMES GRAHAM | |
July 06, 2022 | Hearing | ||
June 07, 2022 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE Appearance | |
May 17, 2022 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
May 17, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS | |
May 13, 2022 | Docket Event | CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FROM EXECUTION RESULT: Order 8/18/2022 HON MICHAEL WU | |
May 13, 2022 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT WITHOUT TRIAL-GENERAL RESULT: BY THE CLERK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.