Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Christine Winn Long, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by 21 2 Timber Ridge Drive, against Marci Fournier Sassy'S Specialty Consignment, represented by 329 Hazard Avenue, in the jurisdiction of Hartford County, CT, . Hartford County, CT Superior Courts with Michael Wu presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 30, 2021 |
CategoryS25 - Small Claims - Small Claims - Contract - Other |
Last RefreshedOctober 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationHartford County, CT |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
ORDER RESULT: Continuance 1/27/2022 HON MICHAEL WU
Date: January 27, 2022ORDER RESULT: Order 3/2/2022 ANTHONY DIPENTIMA, MAG
Date: March 02, 2022ORDER RESULT: Order 4/6/2022 ANTHONY DIPENTIMA, MAG
Date: April 06, 2022SMALL CLAIMS RETURN / STATEMENT OF SERVICE
Date: November 30, 2021SMALL CLAIMS WRIT AND NOTICE OF SUIT, JD-CV-40
Date: November 30, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 06, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Order 4/6/2022 ANTHONY DIPENTIMA, MAG | |
April 06, 2022 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT WITHOUT TRIAL FOR PLAINTIFF RESULT: ANTHONY DIPENTIMA, MAG | |
April 06, 2022 | Remote Hearing | ||
March 02, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Order 3/2/2022 ANTHONY DIPENTIMA, MAG | |
March 02, 2022 | Remote Hearing | ||
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Continuance 1/27/2022 HON MICHAEL WU | |
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS RETURN / STATEMENT OF SERVICE | |
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS WRIT AND NOTICE OF SUIT, JD-CV-40 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.