Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Matthew Ryan Vincelette, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by 212 Bowles Park, against Mark'S Motor Sports, represented by 70 Enfield Street, in the jurisdiction of Hartford County, CT, . Hartford County, CT Superior Courts with Michael Wu presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 04, 2021 |
CategoryS55 - Small Claims - Small Claims - Tort - Other |
Last RefreshedOctober 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationHartford County, CT |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
ANSWER - SMALL CLAIMS
Date: December 08, 2021ORDER RESULT: Order 3/18/2022 SAUNDRA BORGES, MAG
Date: March 18, 2022SMALL CLAIMS RETURN / STATEMENT OF SERVICE
Date: November 04, 2021ORDER RESULT: Continuance 1/13/2022 HON MICHAEL WU
Date: January 13, 2022SMALL CLAIMS WRIT AND NOTICE OF SUIT, JD-CV-40
Date: November 04, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Order 3/18/2022 SAUNDRA BORGES, MAG | |
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT AFTER COMPLETED TRIAL TO THE COURT FOR THE DEFENDANT(S) RESULT: SAUNDRA BORGES, MAG | |
March 18, 2022 | Remote Court Trial | ||
March 04, 2022 | Remote Court Trial | ||
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE JDCV21 - MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE HHD-CV21-5070461-S 03/04/2022 RESULT: Granted 2/17/2022 BY THE COURT | |
January 13, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Continuance 1/13/2022 HON MICHAEL WU | |
January 13, 2022 | Remote Court Trial | ||
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event | ANSWER - SMALL CLAIMS | |
November 04, 2021 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS RETURN / STATEMENT OF SERVICE | |
November 04, 2021 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS WRIT AND NOTICE OF SUIT, JD-CV-40 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.