Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
LVNV FUNDING LLC ASSIGNEE OF CREDIT ONE BANK, N.A. v. ALEXANDER, MONTAZ
A S15 - Small Claims - Small Claims - Collection - Purchase Debt case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Hartford County, CT. Judge Michael Wu presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 07, 2020
Last Refreshed
July 30, 2023
Filing Location
Hartford County, CT
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
David Sheridan;Category
S15 - Small Claims - Small Claims - Collection - Purchase Debt
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
ORDER RESULT: Order 4/13/2022 WILLIAM BARTOL, MAG
Date: Apr 13, 2022MILITARY AFFIDAVIT Updated Military Affidavit
Date: Mar 16, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF DEBT - SMALL CLAIMS
Date: Feb 17, 2022AMENDED COMPLAINT AS SERVED - SMALL CLAIMS RESERVE PACKAGE
Date: Feb 17, 2022ORDER RESULT: Continuance 12/22/2021 HON MICHAEL WU
Date: Dec 22, 2021MILITARY AFFIDAVIT Updated Military Affidavit
Date: Nov 16, 2021MILITARY AFFIDAVIT
Date: Mar 05, 2021ORDER RESULT: Order 12/18/2020 HON DAVID SHERIDAN
Date: Dec 18, 2020LETTER Returned mail RESULT: Order 12/18/2020 HON DAVID SHERIDAN
Date: Dec 16, 2020AFFIDAVIT OF DEBT - SMALL CLAIMS
Date: Dec 07, 2020EXHIBITS
Date: Dec 07, 2020SMALL CLAIMS RETURN / STATEMENT OF SERVICE
Date: Dec 07, 2020SMALL CLAIMS WRIT AND NOTICE OF SUIT, JD-CV-40
Date: Dec 07, 2020MILITARY AFFIDAVIT
Date: Dec 07, 2020Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 13, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Order 4/13/2022 WILLIAM BARTOL, MAG | |
April 13, 2022 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT WITHOUT TRIAL FOR PLAINTIFF RESULT: WILLIAM BARTOL, MAG | |
March 16, 2022 | Docket Event | MILITARY AFFIDAVIT Updated Military Affidavit | |
March 02, 2022 | Remote Hearing | ||
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF DEBT - SMALL CLAIMS | |
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event | AMENDED COMPLAINT AS SERVED - SMALL CLAIMS RESERVE PACKAGE | |
December 22, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Continuance 12/22/2021 HON MICHAEL WU | |
December 22, 2021 | Remote Hearing | ||
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event | MILITARY AFFIDAVIT Updated Military Affidavit | |
March 05, 2021 | Docket Event | MILITARY AFFIDAVIT | |
December 18, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Order 12/18/2020 HON DAVID SHERIDAN | |
December 16, 2020 | Docket Event | LETTER Returned mail RESULT: Order 12/18/2020 HON DAVID SHERIDAN | |
December 07, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF DEBT - SMALL CLAIMS | |
December 07, 2020 | Docket Event | EXHIBITS | |
December 07, 2020 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS RETURN / STATEMENT OF SERVICE | |
December 07, 2020 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS WRIT AND NOTICE OF SUIT, JD-CV-40 | |
December 07, 2020 | Docket Event | MILITARY AFFIDAVIT |