Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
Dominic Sansone, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Goff Law Group Llc, against J. B. Hunt Transport, Inc., Ralston G Lennon, represented by Delsole & Delsole Llp, Gordon & Rees Llp, in the jurisdiction of Hartford County, CT, . Hartford County, CT Superior Courts Superior with Susan Quinn Cobb presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSusan Quinn Cobb Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 05, 2020 |
CategoryV01 - Vehicular - Motor Vehicles - Driver And/Or Passenger(S) Vs. Driver(S) |
Last RefreshedApril 17, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHartford County, CT |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE RESULT: Withdrawn 3/10/2023 BY THE DEFENDANT
Date: March 10, 2023NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE Supplemental Compliance
Date: January 20, 2023NOTICE JB Hunt's Notice of Complance with Non-Standard RFPs
Date: February 28, 2024ORDER RESULT: Denied 2/27/2024 HON SUSAN COBB
Date: February 27, 2024CASEFLOW REQUEST (JD-CV-116) JB Hunt's Caseflow Request re Mot for Order @ dkt 162.00
Date: February 28, 2024MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE RESULT: Granted 3/13/2023 HON SUSAN COBB
Date: March 10, 2023NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE Supplemental Compliance
Date: January 19, 2023ORDER RESULT: Overruled 11/13/2023 HON JAMES SICILIAN
Date: November 13, 2023WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION withdrawal of Motion to continue #149 due to scrivner's error
Date: March 10, 2023NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE Notice of Amended Compliance
Date: February 20, 2024NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE Supplemental Compliance
Date: February 09, 2024OBJECTION TO MOTION to Compel Deposition
Date: November 21, 2023MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME RE DISCOVERY MOTION OR REQUEST PB CH13
Date: November 21, 2023ORDER RESULT: Granted 3/13/2023 HON SUSAN COBB
Date: March 13, 2023ORDER RESULT: Granted 11/13/2023 HON JAMES SICILIAN
Date: November 13, 2023ORDER RESULT: Order 11/27/2023 HON JAMES SICILIAN
Date: November 27, 2023NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE Supplemental Compliance
Date: June 07, 2022NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE Supplemental Compliance
Date: September 27, 2022APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: January 25, 2024ORDER RESULT: Order 2/23/2021 HON ROBERT SHAPIRO
Date: February 23, 2021ORDER RESULT: Granted 10/4/2021 HON SUSAN COBB
Date: October 04, 2021NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE Notice of Further Compliance
Date: March 04, 2022NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE Notice of Supplemental Compliance
Date: March 07, 2022ORDER RESULT: Granted 8/31/2022 HON SUSAN COBB
Date: August 31, 2022ORDER RESULT: Order 2/14/2022 HON JAMES SICILIAN
Date: February 14, 2022ORDER RESULT: Order 10/26/2020 HON ROBERT SHAPIRO
Date: October 26, 2020MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER PB 13-5 RESULT: Order 10/17/2022 HON JAMES SICILIAN
Date: September 29, 2022REQUEST for Continuance of Jury Trial - Explanation
Date: September 15, 2021MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME RE DISCOVERY MOTION OR REQUEST PB CH13
Date: June 15, 2020APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: August 18, 2021MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE Jury Trial - 9-22-22 RESULT: Granted 8/31/2022 HON SUSAN COBB
Date: August 30, 2022COMPLAINT
Date: May 05, 2020NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE Supplemental Compliance
Date: September 06, 2022NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE Supplemental Compliance
Date: September 26, 2022ORDER RESULT: Order 3/21/2022 HON JAMES SICILIAN
Date: March 21, 2022ORDER RESULT: Denied 9/15/2021 HON SUSAN COBB
Date: September 15, 2021OBJECTION TO MOTION for Protective Order by Plaintiff
Date: October 03, 2022REPLY to Defendants' Objection to Motion for Protective Order (Doc. No. 145.00)
Date: October 14, 2022CERTIFICATE OF CLOSED PLEADINGS AND CLAIM FOR TRIAL LIST
Date: August 03, 2020NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE Supplemental Compliance
Date: September 07, 2022MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE RESULT: Granted 11/30/2020 HON DAVID SHERIDAN
Date: November 06, 2020ORDER RESULT: Order 10/17/2022 HON JAMES SICILIAN
Date: October 17, 2022MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE of Jury Trial RESULT: Granted 10/4/2021 HON SUSAN COBB
Date: September 17, 2021OBJECTION TO MOTION Objection to Defendants' Motion for Order of Compliance
Date: July 25, 2022REPLY To TT Objection
Date: July 26, 2022MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE of Jury Trial - corrected RESULT: Denied 9/15/2021 HON SUSAN COBB
Date: September 15, 2021NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE Notice of Service Compliance with Defendant?s Discovery
Date: July 24, 2020NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE Notice of Supplemental Compliance of Defendant?s Discovery
Date: August 02, 2021OBJECTION TO INTERROGATORIES/PRODUCTION PB 13-8 and 13-10
Date: May 05, 2021NOTICE Notice of Service of a Supplemental Request for Production
Date: March 15, 2021NOTICE Notice of Service of Discovery to Defendant- J.B Hunt Transport Inc
Date: June 05, 2020APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: December 28, 2023ORDER RESULT: Order 1/27/2021 HON ROBERT SHAPIRO
Date: January 27, 2021MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO PLEAD
Date: June 03, 2020ORDER RESULT: Granted 11/30/2020 HON DAVID SHERIDAN
Date: November 30, 2020ORDER TMC Order RESULT: Order 11/12/2020 HON DAVID SHERIDAN
Date: November 12, 2020ORDER RESULT: Granted 11/12/2020 BY THE COURT
Date: November 12, 2020SCHEDULING ORDER RESULT: Granted 11/12/2020 BY THE COURT
Date: November 12, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: May 05, 2020REPLY TO SPECIAL DEFENSE
Date: August 03, 2020APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: June 03, 2020OBJECTION TO INTERROGATORIES/PRODUCTION PB 13-8 and 13-10
Date: January 05, 2021NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE
Date: November 05, 2020CLAIM FOR JURY OF 6
Date: July 29, 2020NOTICE Notice of Service of Discovery to Defendant- Ralston G. Lennon
Date: June 05, 2020WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION for Continuance - wrong date
Date: September 15, 2021NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE Supplemental Compliance
Date: August 16, 2022ANSWER AND SPECIAL DEFENSE
Date: July 29, 2020SUMMONS
Date: May 05, 2020ORDER RESULT: Granted 8/3/2020 HON ROBERT SHAPIRO
Date: August 03, 2020MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE of Jury Trial RESULT: Withdrawn 9/15/2021 BY THE DEFENDANT
Date: September 15, 2021MOTION FOR ORDER OF COMPLIANCE – PB SEC 13-14 (INTERR/PROD – 13-6/13-9)
Date: July 12, 2022OBJECTION TO MOTION Objection to Motion to Preclude and for Sanctions
Date: February 29, 2024WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION Withdrawal of Motion for Order - #162.00.
Date: March 13, 2024REPLY Defendants' Response to Plf's Motion for Order of Compliance (dkt. 160)
Date: February 28, 2024CASEFLOW REQUEST (JD-CV-116) RESULT: Granted 3/4/2024 HON SUSAN COBB
Date: March 04, 2024ORDER RESULT: Granted 3/4/2024 HON SUSAN COBB
Date: March 04, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 30, 2024 | Jury Selection / Trial | ||
July 16, 2024 | Trial Management Conference | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | OBJECTION TO REQUEST FOR PHYSICAL OR MENTAL EXAMINATION PB 13-11(b) | |
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR PHYSICAL OR MENTAL EXAM PB 13-11(b) Defendant's Request for IME | |
March 22, 2024 | Jury Selection / Trial | ||
March 18, 2024 | Short Calendar SC-16 #050 | ||
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION Withdrawal of Motion for Order - #162.00. | |
March 08, 2024 | Trial Management Conference | ||
March 05, 2024 | Remote Status Conference | ||
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event | CASEFLOW REQUEST (JD-CV-116) RESULT: Granted 3/4/2024 HON SUSAN COBB |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.