Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Daisy J Zea, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by 157 Malikowski Circle, against Juan Zea, represented by 80 North E. Street, in the jurisdiction of Hartford County, CT, . Hartford County, CT Superior Courts with HON ERIC COLEMAN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHON ERIC COLEMAN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 14, 2022 |
CategoryF00 - Family - Dissolution Of Marriage - C.G.S. Chapter 815J |
Last RefreshedAugust 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHartford County, CT |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 27, 2022 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT FILE | |
April 27, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION TO WAIVE STATUTORY TIME PERIOD BY AGREEMENT OF THE PARTIES - DIVORCE OR LEGAL SEPARATION RESULT: Granted 4/27/2022 HON ERIC COLEMAN | |
April 27, 2022 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF RESOLUTION SCREENING (FORM JD-FM-290) | |
April 27, 2022 | Docket Event | FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT JD-FM-6-SHORT | |
April 27, 2022 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT OF UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION RESULT: HON ERIC COLEMAN | |
April 27, 2022 | Resolution Plan Date | ||
April 19, 2022 | Docket Event | SEPARATION AGREEMENT | |
April 19, 2022 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF FINAL AGREEMENT WITHOUT COURT APPEARANCE (FORM JD-FM-282) | |
March 08, 2022 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE D-01 | |
March 04, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.