Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Daniel C. Dubey, filed a(n) General Family - Family case represented by Peterson Law Group, Peterson Zamat Llc, against Delgado, Lissette, represented by 16 Woodruff St, in the jurisdiction of Hartford County, CT, . Hartford County, CT Superior Courts with HON ERIC COLEMAN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHON ERIC COLEMAN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 15, 2022 |
CategoryF40 - Family - Custody Application - C.G.S. 46B-61 |
Last RefreshedAugust 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHartford County, CT |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF RESOLUTION SCREENING (FORM JD-FM-290) | |
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE | |
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event | AGREEMENT RESULT: Accepted 3/23/2022 HON ERIC COLEMAN | |
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT WITHOUT TRIAL-GENERAL RESULT: HON ERIC COLEMAN | |
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event | DOCUMENT ESTABLISHING LEGAL RELATIONSHIP BETWEEN PARENTS AND CHILD(REN) IN CUST/VIS ACTION PA 18-75 | |
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT FILE Last Updated: Legend Code - 03/28/2022 | |
March 23, 2022 | Remote Resolution Plan Date | ||
March 23, 2022 | Resolution Plan Date | ||
March 09, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE | |
March 02, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION TO VACATE ORDER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.