Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Peter M Githinji, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Apt. D6, against Jamila S Mwetta, represented by Greater Hartford Legal Aid Inc, in the jurisdiction of Hartford County, CT, . Hartford County, CT Superior Courts with HON ERIC COLEMAN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHON ERIC COLEMAN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 22, 2022 |
CategoryF20 - Family - Annulment - C.G.S. Chapter 815J |
Last RefreshedAugust 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHartford County, CT |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY APPEARANCE(S) AUTOWITHDRAWN PB 3-9 | |
June 08, 2022 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT FILE | |
June 08, 2022 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION JUDICIAL DECISION REQUIRED AFTER FULL FINAL HEARING RESULT: HON ERIC COLEMAN | |
June 08, 2022 | Hearing | ||
June 03, 2022 | Docket Event | FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT JD-FM-6-SHORT | |
June 03, 2022 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM Memorandum Opposing Annulment | |
April 27, 2022 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF RESOLUTION SCREENING (FORM JD-FM-290) | |
April 27, 2022 | Docket Event | FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT JD-FM-6-LONG | |
April 27, 2022 | Resolution Plan Date | ||
April 26, 2022 | Docket Event | PROPOSED ORDER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.