Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Jennifer M Valentine, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by 51 Gladiola St, against John R Hubbard, represented by 141 Vons Lane, in the jurisdiction of Hartford County, CT, . Hartford County, CT Superior Courts with HON ERIC COLEMAN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHON ERIC COLEMAN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2022 |
CategoryF00 - Family - Dissolution Of Marriage - C.G.S. Chapter 815J |
Last RefreshedAugust 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHartford County, CT |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 09, 2022 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF RESOLUTION SCREENING (FORM JD-FM-290) | |
March 09, 2022 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT FILE | |
March 09, 2022 | Docket Event | WORKSHEET FOR THE CONNECTICUT CHILD SUPPORT AND ARREARAGE GUIDELINES CCSG-1 | |
March 09, 2022 | Docket Event | AGREEMENT RESULT: Accepted 3/9/2022 HON ERIC COLEMAN | |
March 09, 2022 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT OF UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION RESULT: HON ERIC COLEMAN | |
March 09, 2022 | Resolution Plan Date | ||
February 08, 2022 | Docket Event | DISSOLUTION/LEGAL SEPARATION AGREEMENT (FORM JD-FM-172) | |
February 08, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATION TO COURT OF PARENTING EDUCATION PROGRAM RESULTS BY FAM DIV CGS SEC. 46b-69b(c) | |
January 25, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF REQ FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OF DISS OF MARRIAGE OR LEGAL SEP (FORM JD-FM-281) | |
January 25, 2022 | Docket Event | CUSTODY AGREEMENT AND PARENTING PLAN (FORM JD-FM-284) Last Updated: Legend Code - 01/25/2022 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.