Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Shannon M Boucher, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by 1St Fl, against Jason P Boucher, represented by 70 Osgood Ave, in the jurisdiction of Hartford County, CT, . Hartford County, CT Superior Courts with HON ERIC COLEMAN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHON ERIC COLEMAN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 20, 2021 |
CategoryF00 - Family - Dissolution Of Marriage - C.G.S. Chapter 815J |
Last RefreshedAugust 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHartford County, CT |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 09, 2022 | Docket Event | FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT JD-FM-6-SHORT | |
March 09, 2022 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT OF UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION RESULT: HON ERIC COLEMAN | |
March 09, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION TO WAIVE STATUTORY TIME PERIOD BY AGREEMENT OF THE PARTIES - DIVORCE OR LEGAL SEPARATION RESULT: Granted 3/9/2022 HON ERIC COLEMAN Last Updated: Legend Code - 03/10/2022 | |
March 09, 2022 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF RESOLUTION SCREENING (FORM JD-FM-290) | |
March 09, 2022 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT FILE | |
March 09, 2022 | Docket Event | SEPARATION AGREEMENT | |
March 09, 2022 | Resolution Plan Date | ||
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE | |
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event | BLANK APPEARANCE SERVED WITH COMPLAINT IN ACCORDANCE WITH PA 18-14 | |
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATION - PUBLIC ASSISTANCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.