Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Victor Padilla, filed a(n) General Family - Family case represented by Apt 1, Apt 3, against Yeritza Viera Rivera, represented by 42 Birge Rd, in the jurisdiction of Hartford County, CT, . Hartford County, CT Superior Courts Superior with Eric D. Coleman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEric D. Coleman Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2021 |
CategoryF40 - Family - Custody Application - C.G.S. 46B-61 |
Last RefreshedMarch 13, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHartford County, CT |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 11, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Denied 3/11/2024 HON LINDA ALLARD | |
January 31, 2024 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF RESOLUTION SCREENING (FORM JD-FM-290) | |
January 31, 2024 | Resolution Plan Date | ||
January 09, 2024 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE | |
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | CONTEMPT CITATION ISSUED POST JUDGMENT RESULT: Denied 3/11/2024 HON LINDA ALLARD | |
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION TO WAIVE ENTRY FEE AND PAY COSTS OF SERVICE RESULT: Granted 1/2/2024 HON BARRY ARMATA | |
December 20, 2023 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF RESOLUTION SCREENING (FORM JD-FM-290) | |
December 20, 2023 | Resolution Plan Date | ||
November 20, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Order 11/20/2023 HON EDWARD DOLAN | |
November 20, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE Abode Service Last Updated: Additional Description - 11/21/2023 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.