Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Lynnette A. James, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by 115 Hayes St, Fl 2, against Tyrone James, in the jurisdiction of Hartford County, CT, . Hartford County, CT Superior Courts with HON ERIC COLEMAN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHON ERIC COLEMAN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 19, 2021 |
CategoryF00 - Family - Dissolution Of Marriage - C.G.S. Chapter 815J |
Last RefreshedAugust 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHartford County, CT |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 02, 2022 | Docket Event | INCOME WITHHOLDING ORDER | |
August 02, 2022 | Docket Event | DOCUMENT SEALED | |
August 01, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE | |
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event | WORKSHEET FOR THE CONNECTICUT CHILD SUPPORT AND ARREARAGE GUIDELINES CCSG-1 | |
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF RESOLUTION SCREENING (FORM JD-FM-290) | |
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION AFTER HEARING UPON DEFAULT RESULT: HON ERIC COLEMAN | |
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event | PROPOSED ORDER Proposed Dissolution Orders RESULT: Accepted 3/18/2022 HON ERIC COLEMAN Last Updated: Result Information - 03/18/2022 | |
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT FILE | |
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event | PROPOSED ORDER Proposed custody orders RESULT: Accepted 3/18/2022 HON ERIC COLEMAN | |
March 18, 2022 | Resolution Plan Date |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.